EP0573077 - Method for production of phenol/acetone from cumene hydroperoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | 18.08.1994 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knifton, John Frederick 10900 Catskill Trail Austin, Texas 78750 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Green, Mark Charles Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Green, Mark Charles Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93112448.1 | 03.10.1989 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19890324118 | 17.03.1989 Original published format: US 324118 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573077 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/08, C07C39/04, C07C45/53, C07C49/08 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
B01J21/16 (EP,US);
C07C37/08 (EP,US);
C07C45/53 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/08, C07C39/04 (US,EP);
C07C45/53, C07C49/08 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Phenol/Aceton aus Cumenhydroperoxyd | [1993/49] | English: | Method for production of phenol/acetone from cumene hydroperoxide | [1993/49] | French: | Méthode pour la production de phénol/acétone à partir d'hydroperoxyde de cumène | [1993/49] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 08.08.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89310111.3 / EP0367408 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3187052 (NELSON DORSEY C, et al); | [AP]US4870217 (KNIFTON JOHN F [US]) |