EP0582293 - Alkaline battery, production method of alkaline battery, and applied product using alkaline battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | For all designated states SEIKO ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS LTD. 3-1, Nishitaga 5-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEIKO ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS LTD. 3-1, Nishitaga 5-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Shunji, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Tsugio, c/o Seiko Electronic Components Ltd 3-1, Nishitaga 5-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | 03 /
Sakamoto Hideo c/o Seiko Electronic Components Ltd 3-1, Nishitaga 5-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112516.5 | 04.08.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | JP19920207925 | 04.08.1992 Original published format: JP 20792592 | JP19920207926 | 04.08.1992 Original published format: JP 20792692 | JP19920207927 | 04.08.1992 Original published format: JP 20792792 | JP19920209008 | 05.08.1992 Original published format: JP 20900892 | JP19920238263 | 07.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23826392 | JP19920238264 | 07.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23826492 | JP19920311707 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: JP 31170792 | JP19930011210 | 26.01.1993 Original published format: JP 1121093 | JP19930012956 | 28.01.1993 Original published format: JP 1295693 | JP19930091684 | 19.04.1993 Original published format: JP 9168493 | JP19930162964 | 30.06.1993 Original published format: JP 16296493 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0582293 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0582293 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/06, H01M4/62, H01M4/66, H01M4/42, H01M4/12 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
H01M6/045 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/26 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/38 (KR);
H01M4/42 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/628 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/66 (EP,US);
H01M6/06 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/06] | H01M6/06, H01M4/62, H01M4/66, H01M4/42 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1994/06] | Title | German: | Alkalische Batterie, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese Batterie enthaltende Vorrichtungen | [1994/06] | English: | Alkaline battery, production method of alkaline battery, and applied product using alkaline battery | [1994/06] | French: | Batterie alcaline, méthode de fabrication et dispositifs utilisant cette batterie alcaline | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 03.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/02] | 18.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]EP0457354 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 18,19,48,49 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 42; claims 1-4 * * page 7 - page 9; table 3 * [Y] 21,26,28,33; | [X]FR2634594 (CIPEL WONDER [FR], et al) [X] 2 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 1; claims 1-3 *; | [YX]EP0474382 (EVEREADY BATTERY INC [US]) [Y] 1 * claims 1-15 * * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 6 * [X] 16,17,46,47; | [Y]GB2020478 (ELECTROCHEM INC) [Y] 1 * page 2, lines 7-21 *; | [X]DE1086309 (MARTIN HANS) [X] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 22 * * column 6, lines 4-63 *; | [X]JPS56116270 ; | [X]FR2567327 (DURACELL INT [US]) [X] 2 * page 3, lines 15-33 *; | [E]JPH0620674 ; | [A]US3642539 (KAWAKAMI AKIRA) [A] 1 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 6 * | [XY] - L.BINDER, "CORROSION OF ZINC ELECTRODE MIXTURES IN ALKALINE MEDIA", J.ELECTROANAL. CHEM., LAUSANNE, vol. 180, no. 1-2, pages 495 - 510, XP000563463 [X] 1,20,23,24,27,30,50,51 * page 501 - page 508, paragraph 4; table 1 * * page 495, paragraph 1 - page 496, paragraph 5 * [Y] 21,26,28,33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0368-1874(84)83603-5 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811208), vol. 5, no. 192, Database accession no. (E - 085), & JP56116270 A 00000000 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 2 * abstract * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940420), vol. 18, no. 221, Database accession no. (E - 1540), & JP06020674 A 00000000 (FUJI ELECTROCHEM CO LTD) [E] 1 * abstract * |