EP0582971 - Process for the catalytic purification of automobile exhaust gases with improved cold start behaviour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindner, Dieter, Dr. Fürstenbergstrasse D-63457 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Lox, Egbert, Dr. Grünaustrasse 9 D-63457 Hanau / DE | 03 /
Engler, Bernd, Dr. Treuener Strasse 2 D-63457 Hanau / DE | 04 /
Ostgathe, Klaus Sindlinger Strasse 42 D-65795 Hattersheim / DE | [1994/07] | Application number, filing date | 93112553.8 | 05.08.1993 | [1994/07] | Priority number, date | DE19924226394 | 10.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4226394 | [1994/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582971 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582971 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
B01D53/9481 (EP,KR);
F01N3/0814 (EP,KR);
B01D53/0454 (EP,KR);
F01N3/0835 (EP,KR);
F01N3/101 (KR);
F01N3/20 (EP,KR);
F01N2250/12 (EP,KR);
F01N2370/24 (EP,KR);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/07] | B01D53/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur katalytischen Autoabgasreinigung mit verbessertem Kaltstartverhalten | [1994/07] | English: | Process for the catalytic purification of automobile exhaust gases with improved cold start behaviour | [1994/07] | French: | Procédé d'épuration catalytique des effluents gazeux des automobiles avec un comportement amélioré de démarrage à froid | [1994/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/07] | 27.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0424966 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0441173 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [XD]DE4008789 (SCHATZ OSKAR [DE]); | [X]US5078979 (DUNNE STEPHEN R [US]) |