EP0584604 - Filler for bituminous composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ReDeLa HERSTELLUNG UND VERTRIEB VON BAUSTOFFEN GmbH Dorfstrasse 29 99444 Blankenhain-Grosspillingsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states ReDeLa HERSTELLUNG UND VERTRIEB VON BAUSTOFFEN GmbH Dorfstrasse 29 D-99444 Blankenhain-Grosspillingsdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldbach, Erhard Richard-Wagner-Strasse 51a D-44651 Herne / DE | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Bockermann, Rolf Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Bockermann, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bergstrasse 159 D-44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112556.1 | 05.08.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | DE19924227153 | 17.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4227153 | [1994/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584604 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584604 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/04, C08J11/06, C08L95/00 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP);
C08J11/06 (EP);
C08K3/013 (EP);
C08J2361/06 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L95/00 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/26 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/72 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/74 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/09] | Title | German: | Füller für ein bituminöses Mischgut | [1994/09] | English: | Filler for bituminous composition | [1994/09] | French: | Charge pour mélange bitumineux | [1994/09] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 19.06.1996 | GR | 19.06.1996 | NL | 19.06.1996 | AT | 05.08.1996 | BE | 31.08.1996 | CH | 31.08.1996 | LI | 31.08.1996 | LU | 31.08.1996 | PT | 19.09.1996 | SE | 19.09.1996 | [2003/08] |
Former [2000/05] | DK | 19.06.1996 | |
GR | 19.06.1996 | ||
AT | 05.08.1996 | ||
BE | 31.08.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DK | 19.06.1996 | |
AT | 05.08.1996 | ||
BE | 31.08.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 19.06.1996 | |
DK | 19.06.1996 | ||
AT | 05.08.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | BE | 19.06.1996 | |
AT | 05.08.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/02] | BE | 19.06.1996 | |
AT | 05.08.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | BE | 19.06.1996 | |
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | BE | 19.06.1996 | |
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | SE | 19.09.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD140348 (VYZK USTAV GUMARENSKE PLASTIK) [X] 1 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US4706893 (BROCK JAMES D [US]) [X] 1* column 1, line 41 - line 50 * |