EP0592782 - Termination for pressurized cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Felten & Guilleaume Energietechnik AG Postfach 80 50 01 D-51058 Köln / DE | [1994/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hülsken, Georg, Dr.-Ing. Am Grünen Hang 69 D-47259 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Amerpohl, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Bachstrasse 20 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
Harjes, Bernd, Dr.-Ing. Hannenbusch 10 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 04 /
Grella, Werner Rendsburger Platz 12 D-51065 Köln / DE | [1994/16] | Application number, filing date | 93112557.9 | 05.08.1993 | [1994/16] | Priority number, date | DE19924234265 | 10.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4234265 | [1994/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0592782 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0592782 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592782 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/22, G02B6/44 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
G02B6/52 (EP);
G02B6/4459 (EP);
G02B6/502 (EP);
H02G15/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1994/16] | Title | German: | Endverschluss für ein Druckkabel | [1994/16] | English: | Termination for pressurized cable | [1994/16] | French: | Boîte d'extrémité pour câble sous pression | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 09.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]JPH0556544 ; | [Y]DE2743057 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME CARLSWERK) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [YDA]DE8113501U (FELTEN-GUILLEAUME) [YD] 1-6 * figure -; claim - * [A] 9-11,13; | [Y]GB2153159 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [Y] 1-6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0274228 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [E]FR2696555 (ELECTRICITE RADIO AVIAT MECA [FR]) [E] 1* figure -; claim - * | [YP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930713), vol. 17, no. 371, Database accession no. (E - 1396), & JP05056544 A 19930305 (HITACHI) [YP] 1 * abstract * |