EP0582302 - Fuel transporting hose having inner layer made of fluorine-contained resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1998 [1998/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kodama, Tsutomu, c/o Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kato, Kazuhiro, c/o Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 3600, Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112589.2 | 05.08.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | JP19920211510 | 07.08.1992 Original published format: JP 21151092 | JP19920211511 | 07.08.1992 Original published format: JP 21151192 | JP19920251722 | 21.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25172292 | JP19920251723 | 21.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25172392 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582302 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582302 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/12, F16L11/127, F16L11/10 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
F16L11/08 (EP,US);
F16L11/10 (EP,US);
F16L11/127 (EP,US);
F16L2011/047 (EP,US);
Y10S138/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/06] | Title | German: | Kraftstofftransportschlauch mit Innenschicht aus fluorhaltigem Harz | [1994/06] | English: | Fuel transporting hose having inner layer made of fluorine-contained resin | [1994/06] | French: | Tube pour transport d'essence ayant une couche intérieure en résine contenant de la fluorine | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4171383 ; | [A]SE7908974 ; | [A]JP55090347 ; | [X]DE8904325U ; | [Y]EP0385731 (JAPAN GORE TEX INC [JP]) | [A] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL Section Ch, Week 9231, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A04, AN 92-254371 & JP-A-4 171 383 (TOYODA GOSEI KK.), & JP4171383 A 00000000 | [A] - CENTRAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL Section Ch, Week 8133, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A04, AN 81-59865D & SE-A-7 908 974 (OESTERLUND), & SE7908974 A 00000000 | [A] - CENTRAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL Section Ch, Week 8034, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A04, AN 80-59450C & JP-A-55 090 347 (SUMITOMO ELRC. IND.), & JP55090347 A 00000000 | Examination | JPH097938Y | US4330017 |