EP0601275 - Methods and apparatus for automatically adding fluid reagents to sample containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knipe, Charles R., Jr. 8 Jonlyn Lane Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 02 /
Frank, Lenore Randall RD 1, Box 20 Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 03 /
Hawk, David R. RD 1, Box 1B Landenberg PA 19350 / US | 04 /
Altmayer, Lee H. 3207 Falcon Lane Wilmington DE 19808 / US | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112663.5 | 06.08.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | US19920989419 | 11.12.1992 Original published format: US 989419 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0601275 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0601275 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D11/02, G01N30/28 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
B01D11/0203 (EP);
G01N30/28 (EP);
G01N2030/062 (EP);
G01N30/02 (EP);
G01N30/30 (EP);
G01N30/32 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, B01D15/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/24] | B01D11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1994/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatischen Zugeben von flüssigen Reagenzien in einen Probenbehälter | [1994/24] | English: | Methods and apparatus for automatically adding fluid reagents to sample containers | [1994/24] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour ajouter automatiquement des réactifs liquides à un conteneur | [1994/24] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 12.09.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US5198115 (D.L.STALLING ET AL) [AP] 1-10 * claims 1-9,25,31 *; | [A]EP0275933 (NIHON BUNKO KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1-10 * claims 8,13 *; | [AP]EP0544988 (HEWLETT-PACKARD) [AP] 1-10 * figure 3; claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP0458125 (HEWLETT-PACKARD) [A] 1,7 * figure 3; claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0444299 (HEWLETT-PACKARD) [A] 1,7 * figure 3; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US4964995 (H.L.CHUM ET AL) [A] 7 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPS62148855 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 32, Database accession no. 87-224463, & JPS62148855 A 19870702 (NIPPON BUNKO KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |