blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0588052

EP0588052 - Method and system for the regulation and control of an air-conditioning installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/12]Method for controlling an air-conditioning installation
[1997/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.09.1998
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.10.1998 [1998/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG
6301 Zug / CH
[1997/45]
Former [1994/50]For all designated states
Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG
CH-6301 Zug / CH
Former [1994/12]For all designated states
Landis & Gyr Business Support AG
CH-6301 Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Michalek, Jan
Lenggerweg 5
CH-8907 Wettswil / CH
[1994/12]
Representative(s)Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al
Müller Schupfner & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/34]Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61
D-80085 München / DE
Application number, filing date93112751.809.08.1993
[1994/12]
Priority number, dateCH1992000291416.09.1992         Original published format: CH 291492
[1994/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0588052
Date:23.03.1994
Language:DE
[1994/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0588052
Date:05.11.1997
Language:DE
[1997/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:F24F11/00
[1994/12]
CPC:
F24F11/0008 (EP); F24F11/47 (EP,US); F24F11/30 (EP);
F24F2003/1446 (EP); F24F2011/0002 (EP); F24F2110/10 (EP);
F24F2110/12 (EP); F24F2110/20 (EP); F24F2110/22 (EP);
F24F2221/54 (EP); F24F3/00 (EP); F24F6/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   SE [1994/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Regelung bzw. Steuerung einer Klimaanlage[1997/45]
English:Method and system for the regulation and control of an air-conditioning installation[1997/45]
French:Méthode et système pour le contrôle et la régulation d'une installation de climatisation[1997/45]
Former [1994/12]Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Klimaanlage
Former [1994/12]Method for controlling an air-conditioning installation
Former [1994/12]Méthode de contrôle d'installation de climatisation
Examination procedure28.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/34]
03.07.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.1997Fee for grant paid
04.07.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS5824739  ;
 [A]DE2839042  (LTG LUFTTECHNISCHE GMBH) [A] 1,7 * page 9, line 10 - page 25, line 18; figures 1,3 *;
 [DYA]DE3439288  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DY] 1,2,7 * page 8, line 4 - page 17, line 25; figures 1-6 * [DA] 3-5;
 [A]EP0238979  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 42; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2644228  (IB2 TECHNOLOGIES [FR], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 5, line 27 - page 12, line 22; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]  - BORK, "energieeinsparung bei lüftungs- und klimaanlagen mit hilfe verbesserter automatisierungskonzepte", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS - ATP, MUNCHEN DE, (1986), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 184 - 190, XP002003975 [Y] 1,2,7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830506), vol. 7, no. 104, Database accession no. (M - 212), & JP58024739 A 00000000 (HITACHI) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.