EP0600158 - Light transmission apparatus for electro-optically coupling to a display panel for an electronic instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1998 [1998/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yergenson, Robin P. 2080 N. Astaire Way Meridian, Idaho 83642 / US | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112826.8 | 10.08.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | US19920984035 | 01.12.1992 Original published format: US 984035 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600158 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0600158 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/30, G09F9/33 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
G09F9/305 (EP,US);
G01D11/28 (EP,US);
G02B6/0006 (EP,US);
G02B6/0008 (EP,US);
G02B6/4298 (EP,US);
Y10S362/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/23] | Title | German: | Lichtübertragungsapparat zur elektro-optischen Kopplung mit der Anzeigetafel eines elektronischen Instruments | [1997/07] | English: | Light transmission apparatus for electro-optically coupling to a display panel for an electronic instrument | [1994/23] | French: | Dispositif de conduction de la lumière pour le couplage électro-optique vers le panneau d'affichage d'un instrument électronique | [1994/23] |
Former [1994/23] | Lichtübertragungsapparat zur elektropoptischen Kopplung mit der Anzeigetafel eines elektronischen Instruments | Examination procedure | 22.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4106231 (MACNIEL DOUGLAS K) [A] 1* column 3, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figure 4 *; | [X]DE3048288 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * page 5 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0310889 (PEIKER ANDREAS) [A] 1,8,9 * column 5, paragraph L; figure 6 * * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1 * |