EP0583723 - Card, card reader and method for protocol selection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 9, place des Vosges La Défense 5 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS (S.A.) 9, Place des Vosges, La Défense 5 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naccache, David 46, rue St. George F-94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR | 02 /
Fremanteau, Patrice 30, rue des Carmes F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
Hartnack, Wolfgang Zilleweg 14a D-31303 Burgdorf / DE | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Licensing & Intellectual Property, Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1995/23] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1994/08] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112842.5 | 11.08.1993 | [1994/08] | Priority number, date | EP19920402313 | 20.08.1992 Original published format: EP 92402313 | [1994/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583723 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K19/07 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06K19/07 (EP);
G06K19/07769 (EP);
G06K7/10297 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/4097 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/08] | Title | German: | Karte, Kartenleser und Verfahren zur Protokollauswahl | [1994/08] | English: | Card, card reader and method for protocol selection | [1994/08] | French: | Carte, lecteur de carte et méthode de sélection de protocoles | [1994/08] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/52] | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62130040 ; | [A]JP62103742 ; | [A]JP63250726 ; | [Y]EP0451936 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [Y]EP0202622 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 351 (E-557)17 November 1987 & JP-A-62 130 040 ( TOSHIBA CORP ) 12 June 1987, & JP62130040 A 19870612 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 313 (P-626)13 October 1987 & JP-A-62 103 742 ( TOSHIBA CORP ) 14 May 1987, & JP62103742 A 19870514 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 064 (P-827)14 February 1989 & JP-A-63 250 726 ( HITACHI MAXELL LTD ) 18 October 1988, & JP63250726 A 19881018 |