Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59304520D1 | 02.01.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE59304520 | 11.08.1993 | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2697754B | ![]() | 14.01.1998 | B2 | JPH06172210 | 21.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0583726 | ![]() | 20.11.1996 | B1 | EP0583726 | 08.06.1994 | A3 | EP0583726 | 23.02.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE145326T | 15.12.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2101086 | 16.03.2004 | C | CA2101086 | 20.02.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ284266 | 14.10.1998 | B6 | CZ170993 | 16.03.1994 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4227385 | 24.02.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0583726T | 09.12.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2094431T | 16.01.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3021841T | 28.02.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU211093 | 30.10.1995 | B | HUT67578 | 28.04.1995 | A | HU9302250D0 | 28.10.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU211869A9 | 28.12.1995 | A9 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9305029 | 29.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK279127B | 08.07.1998 | B6 | SK87493 | 06.04.1994 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5378462 | 03.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA935085 | 04.02.1994 | B | Priority number | Date | DE4227385 | 19.08.1992 |