EP0588065 - Package for compounding rubber, compounded rubber and method of compounding rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/12] | Package for compounding rubber and compounded rubber | ||
[1996/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kansupada, Bharat Kanchanlal 1641 Poppy Drive Mogadore, Ohio 44260 / US | 02 /
Taylor, Robert Joe 845 Hampton Ridge Akron, Ohio 44313 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg Patent-Department L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [1994/12] | Application number, filing date | 93112930.8 | 12.08.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | US19920932115 | 19.08.1992 Original published format: US 932115 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0588065 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0588065 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588065 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/38, C08J3/20 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (KR);
B65D65/38 (EP,US);
C08J3/223 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
C08J2467/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1994/12] | Title | German: | Verpackung zum Compoundieren von Gummi, compoundiertes Gummi und Verfahren zum Compoundieren von Gummi | [1996/42] | English: | Package for compounding rubber, compounded rubber and method of compounding rubber | [1996/42] | French: | Emballage pour le mélange de composants de caoutchouc, composition de caoutchouc et procédé pour la composition de caoutchouc | [1996/42] |
Former [1994/12] | Verpackung zum Compoundieren von Gummi und compoundiertes Gummi | ||
Former [1994/12] | Package for compounding rubber and compounded rubber | ||
Former [1994/12] | Emballage pour le mélange de composants de caoutchouc et composition de caoutchouc | Examination procedure | 12.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4248348 (BUTLER KIM D, et al) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US4334615 (BUTLER KIM D, et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH01185363 ; | [A]JPH0295890 ; | [PA]JPH0559611 ; | [A]JPS5787453 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891025), vol. 013, no. 472, Database accession no. (C - 647), & JP01185363 A 19890724 (UNITIKA) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900628), vol. 014, no. 300, Database accession no. (M - 0991), & JP02095890 A 19900406 (RICOH) [A] 1 * abstract * | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 15, Database accession no. 93-121845, & JPH0559611 A 19930309 (NIPPON UNICAR) [PA] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 39, Database accession no. 82-56215E, & JPS5787453 A 19820531 (MITSUBISHI) [A] 4 * abstract * |