EP0586950 - Seeddrill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreyer, Heinz, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Am Amazonenwerk 7 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | 02 /
von Bülow, Hans Bielefelderstrasse 3 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | 03 /
Wiemeyer, Benno Im Sande 6 D-49504 Lotte / DE | 04 /
Dreyer, Justus Am Amazonenwerk 7 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | 05 /
Scheufler, Bernd, Dr. Am Amazonenwerk 101 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | [1998/24] |
Former [1994/11] | 01 /
Dreyer, Heinz, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Am Amazonenwerk 7 D-49502 Hasbergen / DE | ||
02 /
von Bülow, Hans Bielefelderstrasse 3 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | |||
03 /
Wiemeyer, Benno Im Sande 6 D-49504 Lotte / DE | |||
04 /
Dreyer, Justus Am Amazonenwerk 7 D-49502 Hasbergen / DE | |||
05 /
Scheufler, Bernd, Dr. Am Amazonenwerk 101 D-49502 Hasbergen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113310.2 | 20.08.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | DE19924229211 | 04.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4229211 | DE19924233443 | 05.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233443 | DE19924235494 | 21.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4235494 | [1994/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0586950 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0586950 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586950 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/00, A01B49/06, A01C7/08, A01C5/06 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
A01B49/065 (EP);
A01C5/068 (EP);
A01C7/006 (EP);
Y02A40/22 (EP);
Y02P60/00 (EP);
Y02P60/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/11] | A01C7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/11] | Title | German: | Drillmaschine | [1994/11] | English: | Seeddrill | [1994/11] | French: | Semoir | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Request for further processing for: | 22.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0049330 (WEICHEL ERNST) [A] 1,8-13,17,23,24,26-28 * page 5, line 25 - page 14, line 23; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE3627801 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [A] 1,5,8,9 * column 1, line 43 - column 3, line 14; figure . *; | [PA]FR2684514 (BELIN JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [PA] 1,8-13,17 * page 4, line 35 - page 6, line 30; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE4025989 (HENDLMEIER KONRAD [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 50; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE67768 (GASSER S.) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3743032 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) |