EP0589208 - Process for the preparation of suspensions of cyanuric chloride in aqueous fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa AG Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states DEGUSSA AG Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanheertum, Rudolf Dr. Fortuinstraat 22 B-2180 Ekeren-Antwerpern / BE | 02 /
Hendricx, Richard Victor Govaerslaan 33-Bus 9 B-2170 Merksem-Antwerpen / BE | 03 /
Kriebitzsch, Norbert Dr. Kardinaal Cardijnplein 4 B-2950 Kapellen / BE | 04 /
Van de Velde, Francois Sluitberg 10 B-2170 Merksem-Antwerpen / BE | 05 /
Schirrmacher, Rüdiger Philipp-Reis-Strasse 16 D-63454 Hanau / DE | [1994/13] | Application number, filing date | 93113313.6 | 20.08.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | DE19924232117 | 25.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4232117 | [1994/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0589208 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0589208 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589208 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/28 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
C07D251/28 (EP,US);
C04B41/4861 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Suspensionen von Cyanurchlorid in wässrigen Flüssigkeiten | [1994/13] | English: | Process for the preparation of suspensions of cyanuric chloride in aqueous fluids | [1994/13] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de suspensions de chlorure de cyanuryle dans des fluides aqueuses | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 26.05.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0094665 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE2850242 (DEGUSSA AG) [AD] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]EP0200151 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |