Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5755914 | 26.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US11097293 | 24.08.1993 | JP24717392 | 25.08.1992 | US47865595 | 07.06.1995 | US67584496 | 05.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3192000B | Global Dossier | 23.07.2001 | B2 | JPH0677101 | 18.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24717392 | 25.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0584778 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2003 | B1 | EP0584778 | 08.10.1997 | A3 | EP0584778 | 02.03.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP24717392 | 25.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69333282T | 26.08.2004 | T2 | DE69333282D1 | 11.12.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP24717392 | 25.08.1992 |