EP0585777 - Intermediate member for fixing the guide rails to an elevator shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/10] | Procedure for fixing the guide rails to an elevator shaft by means of an intermediate member, and an intermediate member | ||
[1996/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Elevator GmbH Rathausstrasse 1 6340 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states KONE Elevator GmbH Rathausstrasse 1 CH-6340 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korhonen, Helge Huvijärventie 7 SF-12100 Oitti / FI | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Zipse + Habersack Kemnatenstrasse 49 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113474.6 | 24.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | FI19920003908 | 31.08.1992 Original published format: FI 923908 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585777 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585777 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/02 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
B66B7/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/10] | Title | German: | Zwischenträger zum Befestigen der Führungsschienen in einem Aufzugsschacht | [1996/48] | English: | Intermediate member for fixing the guide rails to an elevator shaft | [1996/48] | French: | Entretoise pour fixer des guides de cabine dans une cage d'ascenseur | [1996/48] |
Former [1994/10] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Befestigen der Führungsschienen in einem Aufzugsschacht mittels eines Zwischenträgers | ||
Former [1994/10] | Procedure for fixing the guide rails to an elevator shaft by means of an intermediate member, and an intermediate member | ||
Former [1994/10] | Procédé et dispositif pour fixer des guides de cabine dans une cage d'ascenseur à l'aide d'une entretoise | Examination procedure | 24.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB760956 ; | [A]DE1239452 ; | [A]AU4291989 ; | [A]US4577729 ; | [A]DE950682 ; | [A]DE1081634 |