EP0585778 - Process for the preparation of powder mixtures for lustreless polycarbonate moulding compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/10] | Powder mixtures for lustreless polycarbonate moulding compositions | ||
[1996/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wittmann, Dieter, Dr. Wolfskaul 4 D-51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
Schoeps, Jochen, Dr. Windmühlenstrasse 126 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Beicher, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Seidenstrasse 11 D-47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 04 /
Piejko, Karl-Erwin, Dr. Unterscheider Weg 7a D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 05 /
Weirauch, Kurt, Dr. Am Vogelherd 32 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [1994/10] | Application number, filing date | 93113476.1 | 24.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | DE19924229642 | 04.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4229642 | [1994/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0585778 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0585778 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585778 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08L101/00, C08L51/04, C08L21/02 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L69/005 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L57/00 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L69/005, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pulvermischungen für matte Polycarbonat-Formmassen | [1996/41] | English: | Process for the preparation of powder mixtures for lustreless polycarbonate moulding compositions | [1996/41] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de masse à mouler de polycarbonates délustrée | [1996/41] |
Former [1994/10] | Pulvermischungen für matte Polycarbonat-Formmassen | ||
Former [1994/10] | Powder mixtures for lustreless polycarbonate moulding compositions | ||
Former [1994/10] | Masse à mouler de polycarbonates délustrée | Examination procedure | 29.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1170141 ; | [AD]US4677162 (GRIGO ULRICH R [DE], et al); | [X]EP0429957 (BASF AG [DE]) |