EP0606528 - Electrically driven liquid pumping system with aeration device as well as connecting flange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weinberg, Ulli Bahnhofstrasse 22/24 D-91154 Roth / DE | For all designated states Hohenleitner, Herbert Jordanstrasse 10-12 D-90513 Zirndorf / DE | [1994/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinberg, Ulli Bahnhofstr. 22/24 D-91154 Roth / DE | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113488.6 | 24.08.1993 | [1994/29] | Priority number, date | DE19924242021 | 12.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4242021 | [1994/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0606528 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0606528 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/60, F04D13/08, A01K63/04 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
F04D29/606 (EP);
A01K63/047 (EP);
F04D13/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/29] | Title | German: | Elektrisch antreibbares Flüssigkeitspumpensystem, Belüftungseinrichtung sowie Anschlussflansch | [1994/29] | English: | Electrically driven liquid pumping system with aeration device as well as connecting flange | [1994/29] | French: | Système de pompage de liquide, dispositif d'oxygénation ainsi que bride de raccordement | [1994/29] | File destroyed: | 13.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/02] | 11.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.1995 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1465195 (BLUM) [X] 1-3,7,12,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE1488461 (BLUM) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE8617656U (ASHAUER ERNST) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4024064 (RAKOWICZ ET AL.); | [A]FR1248184 (BERGMAN) |