EP0584811 - Process for the preparation of a grain stabilized high chloride tabular grain photographic emulsion (III) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maskasky, Joe Edward, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113591.7 | 25.08.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | US19920935806 | 27.08.1992 Original published format: US 935806 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584811 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584811 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/005, G03C1/12 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
G03C1/0053 (EP,US);
G03C1/015 (EP,US);
G03C1/07 (EP,US);
G03C1/12 (EP,US);
G03C1/18 (EP,US);
G03C2200/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/21] |
Former [1994/09] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Korn-stabilisierten photographischen Emulsion mit tafelförmigen Körnern von hohem Chloridgehalt (III) | [1994/09] | English: | Process for the preparation of a grain stabilized high chloride tabular grain photographic emulsion (III) | [1994/09] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une émulsion photographique à grain stabilisé à base de grains tabulaires à haute teneur en chlorure (III) | [1996/41] |
Former [1994/09] | Procédé de préparation d'une émulsion photographique à grain stabilisé à base de grains tabulaires à haute teneur en chlorure | Examination procedure | 16.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 20.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0288949 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0481133 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]); | [AP]EP0533189 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | [AD] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE vol. 308, no. 119, December 1989, HAVANT GB 'Photographic silver halide emulsions' |