EP0624416 - Method and apparatus for assessing and restoring solderability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell International Corporation 2201 Seal Beach Boulevard Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2201 Seal Beach Boulevard Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tench, Morgan, D. 1198 Navigator Drive No.85 Ventura, CA 93001 / US | 02 /
Anderson, Dennis P. 652 Avenida Del Platino Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113688.1 | 26.08.1993 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | US19930060328 | 11.05.1993 Original published format: US 60328 | [1994/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0624416 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0624416 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/20 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
B23K1/206 (EP,US);
B23K1/20 (EP,US);
G01N27/4161 (EP,US);
G01N27/42 (EP,US);
H05K3/22 (EP,US);
B23K2101/40 (EP,US);
B23K2101/42 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0315 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1157 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Bestimmung und Wiederherstellung der Lötbarheit | [1994/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for assessing and restoring solderability | [1994/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour déterminer et restituer pondabilité | [1994/46] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 21.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/19] | 07.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5104494 (TENCH D MORGAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10 * column 2, line 6 - line 10 * * column 2, line 26 - line 35 * * column 3, line 26 - line 54 *; | [E]US5262022 (TENCH D MORGAN [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3684679 (SMITH JOHN R, et al) [A] 1-3,6-8 * column 6, line 35 - line 64; figure 9 *; | [A]US4725339 (BINDRA PERMINDER [US], et al); | [A]FR1569772 (UGINE KUHLMANN); | [A]FR2560797 (ASM FICO TOOLING [NL]) |