blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0585892

EP0585892 - Exhaust gas purification apparatus having heat exchanger and muffler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.1996
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.1996Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.04.1996 [1996/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bezold, Dieter Eugen
Herrnschachstrasse 6
D-90453 Nürnberg / DE
For all designated states
Schwarzer, Rolf-Thomas
Heinrich-Stranka-Strasse 6
D-90765 Fürth/Bay. / DE
For all designated states
Gammel, Michael
Heinrich-Stranka-Strasse 6
D-90765 Fürth/Bay. / DE
[1994/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Schwarzer, Rolf-Thomas
Erlanger Strasse 20
D-90542 Eckental / DE
02 / Gammel, Michael
Münstererstrasse 5
D-93326 Abensberg / DE
[1994/10]
Representative(s)Besendorfer, Hans, et al
Friedrichstrasse 16
90408 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/10]Besendorfer, Hans, Dr., et al
Friedrichstrasse 16
D-90408 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date93113940.601.09.1993
[1994/10]
Priority number, dateDE19920011888U03.09.1992         Original published format: DE 9211888 U
DE1992422944503.09.1992         Original published format: DE 4229445
[1994/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0585892
Date:09.03.1994
Language:DE
[1994/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:F23J15/00, F23M13/00, B01D53/00
[1994/10]
CPC:
F23J15/06 (EP); B01D53/002 (EP); B01D53/326 (EP);
F23J15/04 (EP); F23M20/005 (EP); F23J2900/13003 (EP);
Y02E20/30 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/10]
TitleGerman:Abgasreinigungsanlage mit Abgaswärmetauscher und Schalldämpfer[1994/10]
English:Exhaust gas purification apparatus having heat exchanger and muffler[1994/10]
French:Dispostif pour le purification des gaz d'échappement avec échangeur de chaleur et silencieux[1994/10]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure13.04.1994Examination requested  [1994/24]
06.06.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.1995Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/16]
17.11.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1996/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4008818  (PARIL HUGO [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 52 - line 56 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 14; figure 1 * [A] 3-7;
 [A]US4204844  (PILAT MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 3 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 14; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR1292327  (LAUTRETTE) [A] 4,5,7 * page 3, column L, line 11 - line 48; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE3935898  (MUENCHNER MEDIZIN MECHANIK [DE]) [A] 6 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]CH433411  (SCHEER & CIE C F [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.