EP0585948 - Circuit arrangement for converting an AC voltage from a supply line into a DC voltage by taking a substantially sinusoidal current at the powerline frequency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herfurth, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Ludwig-Thoma-Strasse 22 D-82205 Gilching / DE | [1994/10] | Application number, filing date | 93114169.1 | 03.09.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | DE19924229513 | 04.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4229513 | [1994/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585948 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/158 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
H02M3/1582 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/10] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Umsetzung der Wechselspannung eines Versorgungsnetzes in eine Ausgleichsspannung mit einer im wesentlichen sinusförmigen, netzfrequenten Stromaufnahme | [1994/10] | English: | Circuit arrangement for converting an AC voltage from a supply line into a DC voltage by taking a substantially sinusoidal current at the powerline frequency | [1994/10] | French: | Dispositif de circuit pour convertir un courant alternatif d'un réseau d'alimentation en un courant continu avec une consommation de courant sensiblement sinusoidal à la fréquence du réseau | [1994/10] | File destroyed: | 08.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/21] | 30.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8911691 (VITEQ) [X] 1-5 * page 5, line 16 - page 2, line 8 *; | [X]US4502104 (MITCHELL) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 43 - column 7, line 14 *; | [X]US5134355 (HASTINGS) [X] 1-5 * column 6 - column 22 *; | [XP]EP0504094 (EMERSON ELECTRIC) [XP] 1-5 * column 3, line 38 - column 11, line 52 * |