blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0587096

EP0587096 - Camera equipped with data imprinting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.02.2001 [2001/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1994/11]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Machida, Kiyosada
3-4-502,Oomaki
Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Soshi, Isao
2-7-14-303,Hatsudai
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Miyamoto, Hidenori
6-203,Hinode
Urayasu-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
[1994/12]
Former [1994/11]01 / Machida, Kiyosada
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Soshi, Isao
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Miyamoto, Hidenori
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Rauh, Helga
Merten & Pfeffer Patentverwaltung Allersberger Strasse 185
90461 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Rauh, Helga
Wielandstrasse 4
90419 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1999/06]Merten, Fritz
Tristanstrasse 5
90461 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1999/05](deleted)
Former [1994/11]Merten, Fritz
Tristanstrasse 5
D-90461 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date93114291.306.09.1993
[1994/11]
Priority number, dateJP1992026549808.09.1992         Original published format: JP 26549892
JP1992024358411.09.1992         Original published format: JP 24358492
[1994/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0587096
Date:16.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0587096
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1993
ClassificationIPC:G03B17/24
[1994/11]
CPC:
G03B17/24 (EP); G03B2217/243 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [1994/11]
TitleGerman:Kamera, die mit einer Vorrichtung zum Aufbelichten von Daten ausgestattet ist[1994/11]
English:Camera equipped with data imprinting device[1994/11]
French:Caméra ayant un dispositif d'impression photographique des données[1994/11]
Examination procedure13.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/45]
14.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.1999Fee for grant paid
01.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
10.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP03025426  ;
 [A]JP04009023  ;
 [AD]JP02304538  ;
 [Y]US4101912
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 156 (P-1192)18 April 1991 & JP-A-03 025 426 ( SEIKO EPSON ) 4 February 1991, & JP03025426 A 19910204
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 159 (P-1339)17 April 1992 & JP-A-04 009 023 ( RICOH ) 13 January 1992, & JP04009023 A 19920113
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 88 (P-1174)4 March 1991 & JP-A-02 304 538 ( CANON ) 18 December 1990, & JP02304538 A 19901218
ExaminationUS4994830
 DE3435309
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.