EP0587100 - Polystyrene composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Akihiko 216, Imazuasayama Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Nobuyuki 216, Imazuasayama Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93114295.4 | 07.09.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | JP19920241581 | 10.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24158192 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587100 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587100 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/06, C08L71/12, C08L51/08 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08L71/12 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L71/12, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | Polystyrol-Zusammensetzung | [1994/11] | English: | Polystyrene composition | [1994/11] | French: | Composition de polystyrène | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.08.1996 | BE | 21.08.1996 | CH | 21.08.1996 | ES | 21.08.1996 | LI | 21.08.1996 | SE | 21.11.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
CH | 26.11.1996 | ||
LI | 26.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/24] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 21.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0356857 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-10 * page 5, line 19 - line 22 * * page 5, line 42 - line 49 * * examples 1,10,14,17 ** claims 1-4 *; | [PX]EP0546497 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [PX] 1,3,5,7 * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 3 * * examples prep2,3 * * examples 8-12; tables 2,3 * * claims 1-15 * |