EP0632954 - Earth working tool with loading capacity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1998 [1998/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIEDENMANN GMBH D-89192 Rammingen / DE | [1995/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Flügel, Otto Flügel Preissner Kastel, Postfach 81 05 06 81905 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser & Flügel, Postfach 81 05 06 D-81905 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93114450.5 | 08.09.1993 | [1995/02] | Priority number, date | DE19930010056U | 06.07.1993 Original published format: DE 9310056 U | [1995/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632954 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632954 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/70, E01H1/08 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
A01D43/063 (EP);
E01H1/0827 (EP);
A01D2101/00 (EP);
A01D34/63 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/02] | Title | German: | Bodenbearbeitungsgerät mit einem Sammelbehälter | [1995/02] | English: | Earth working tool with loading capacity | [1995/02] | French: | Machine de travail du sol avec benne chargeuse | [1995/02] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4047368 (PETERSON JAMES F) [A] 15* column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-6 *; | [XA]FR2530920 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 20; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,5,10,14; | [XA]FR2602953 (CHARPENET LOUIS [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 7, line 17 - page 11, line 10; figures 1-11 * [A] 10,13,14; | [A]US4922696 (BURNS STEPHEN R [US], et al) [A] 8-13,15 * column 2, line 43 - column 7, line 37; figures 1-19 * |