EP0588275 - Storing device having movable support elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): IE | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piazza, Antonio Via Tuzzi, 87 36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states Piazza, Antonio Via Tuzzi, 87 I-36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Hranitzky, Wilhelm Max, et al c/o WILLIAM BLANC & CIE Conseils en Propriété Industrielle SA 6, rue de la Grotte 1003 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Hranitzky, Wilhelm Max, et al c/o WILLIAM BLANC & CIE Conseils en Propriété Industrielle SA 6, rue de la Grotte CH-1003 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 93114652.6 | 13.09.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | IT1992VI00136 | 18.09.1992 Original published format: IT VI920136 | [1994/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588275 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588275 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/10, B65G49/06 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
B65G49/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | Lagereinrichtung mit fahrbaren Tragelementen | [1994/12] | English: | Storing device having movable support elements | [1994/12] | French: | Dispositif d'entreposage à éléments de support déplaçables | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 18.12.1996 | SE | 18.03.1997 | IE | 18.08.1997 | [2002/10] |
Former [1999/16] | DK | 18.12.1996 | |
IE | 18.12.1996 | ||
SE | 18.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 18.12.1996 | |
SE | 18.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | SE | 18.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1807075 (SKAR JOHN G L, et al); | [A]DE1957281 (KLUGE WILLI [DE]); | [A]US4140225 (HILGERS WILLIAM H, et al); | [XP]EP0506198 (PIAZZA ANTONIO [IT]) |