EP0592817 - Gas turbine plant with a pressure wave machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 CH-5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Althaus, Rolf, Dr. Kerbelring 24 CH-9230 Flawil / CH | 02 /
Wettstein, Hans, Dr. Klarastrasse 12 CH-5442 Fislisbach / CH | 03 /
Frutschi, Hans Ulrich Bruggerstrasse 9 CH-5223 Riniken / CH | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Klein, Ernest, et al Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht(TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 I 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Klein, Ernest, et al ABB Management AG TEI-Immaterialgüterrecht Postfach Wiesenstrasse 26/28 CH-5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 93114657.5 | 13.09.1993 | [1994/16] | Priority number, date | DE19924234248 | 10.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4234248 | [1994/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0592817 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592817 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/02 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
F02C3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1994/16] | Title | German: | Gasturbogruppe mit einer Druckwellenmaschine als Brennkammer | [1994/16] | English: | Gas turbine plant with a pressure wave machine | [1994/16] | French: | Installation de turbine à gaz avec machine à ondes de pression | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1110302 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 4 * page 1, line 52 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0503277 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - column 6, line 22 *; | [A]EP0212181 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US4111598 (KASUYA TAMOTSU) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2189844 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [A]US2705867 (LEWIS ROBERT B) |