EP0590425 - Control of crustaceous fish parasites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/14] | Control of fish parasites | ||
[1999/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2001/04] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löhr, Reinhold, Dr. Steinenkamp 7 D-51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Mundt, Hans-Christian, Dr. Lessingstrasse 30 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 03 /
Andrews, Peter, Dr. Gellertweg 2 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | [1994/14] | Application number, filing date | 93114919.9 | 16.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | DE19924232561 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4232561 | [1994/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590425 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590425 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01N61/00, A01N51/00, A01N47/44, A01N47/40, A01N43/86, A01N43/50, A01N43/40 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/4406 (KR);
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/86 (EP,US);
A01N47/40 (EP,US);
A01N47/44 (EP,US);
A01N51/00 (EP,US);
A01N61/00 (EP,US);
A23K20/137 (KR);
A23K50/80 (KR);
A61K31/4439 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1999/52] | A01N51/00, A01N47/44, A01N47/40, A01N43/86, A01N43/50, A01N43/40 | ||
Former IPC [1994/14] | A01N61/00, A01N51/00, A01N47/44, A01N47/40, A01N43/86, A01N43/50, A01N43/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Bekämpfung von parasitierenden Krebsen an Fischen | [1999/52] | English: | Control of crustaceous fish parasites | [1999/52] | French: | Lutte contre les crustacés parasites des poissons | [1999/52] |
Former [1994/14] | Bekämpfung von Fischparasiten | ||
Former [1994/14] | Control of fish parasites | ||
Former [1994/14] | Lutte contre les parasites des poissons | Examination procedure | 07.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]EP0163855 (NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK [JP]) [XD] 5 * page 1 - page 2, line 8 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 4 * * page 8, line 1 - line 5 * * page 28, line 16 - line 26 * * examples 12,16 * [Y] 1; | [Y]JPH05203812 ; | [X]EP0292822 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 9 * * page 7, line 34 - page 11, line 37 * * page 12, line 30 - line 33 * * Seite 13, Zeilen 28-30, 50-54 *; | [A]JPS49102823 ; | [DA]EP0407343 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-5 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 47 *; | [A]CA2003459 | [Y] - SANKYO K.K., CENTRAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, (1977), vol. 77, no. 18, Database accession no. 77-31877Y/18, & JPH05203812 A 00000000 [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - CENTRAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 42, Database accession no. 75-69434W/42, & JPS49102823 A 00000000 (KUMIAI CHEM. IND. K.K.) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - D.B.SATELLE ET AL., "Actions of the insecticide 2-(nitromethylene)- tetrahydro-1,3-thiazine on insect and vertebrate nictonic acetylcholine receptors", BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900715), vol. 90, no. 2, Database accession no. 18549 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * & PROCEEDINGS OF THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF LONDON B: BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES 237(1289), 501-514 (1989) * | [AP] - C.J. CHURCH ET AL., "Properties of alpha-bungarotoxin binding cholinergic receptors in pyrethroid susceptible and resistant tobacco budworm moths", BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930101), vol. 95, no. 1, Database accession no. 5222 [AP] 1-5 * abstract * * & COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMSTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, C: COMPARATIVE PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY 102(3),463-469 (1992) * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1990), vol. 90, no. 31, Database accession no. 90-231525/31, & CA2003459 A 00000000 (SALK INST FOR BIOL STUD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |