EP0590430 - Device for the automatic control of a processing plant by means of fuzzy logic control having preferred applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 31.08.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furumoto, Herbert, Dr. Schenkstrasse 146 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Fricke, Christian, Dr. Gartenstrasse 20 D-30989 Gehrden / DE | [1994/14] | Application number, filing date | 93114943.9 | 16.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | DE19924233093 | 01.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233093 | [1994/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0590430 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0590430 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590430 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02, D21G9/00 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
G05B13/0275 (EP);
D21C3/228 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, PT, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur automatischen Führung einer verfahrenstechnischen Anlage durch Fuzzy-Steuerung des Prozessführungsraumes, mit bevorzugten Verwendungen | [1994/14] | English: | Device for the automatic control of a processing plant by means of fuzzy logic control having preferred applications | [1994/14] | French: | Dispositif pour la commande automatique d'une installation de traitement basée sur la logique floue et ayant des applications préférées | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.10.1998
17.11.1998
ADMISSIBLE Metso Paper Automation Oy Lentokentänkatu 11 33900 Tampere / FI Opponent's representative Knauer, Reinhard Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.10.1998
17.11.1998
ADMISSIBLE Metso Paper Automation Oy Lentokentänkatu 11 33900 Tampere / FI Opponent's representative Knauer, Reinhard Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.10.1998
Valmet Automation Inc. Panuntie 6 00620 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Knauer, Reinhard Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 07.12.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.06.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.04.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/42] | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.04.1998 | GB | 16.09.1998 | DE | 01.07.2000 | AT | 16.09.2000 | SE | 17.09.2000 | PT | 31.03.2001 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/31] | GB | 16.09.1998 | |
DE | 01.07.2000 | ||
AT | 16.09.2000 | ||
SE | 17.09.2000 | ||
PT | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/25] | GB | 16.09.1998 | |
DE | 01.07.2000 | ||
AT | 16.09.2000 | ||
PT | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/13] | GB | 16.09.1998 | |
DE | 01.07.2000 | ||
AT | 16.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | GB | 16.09.1998 | |
AT | 16.09.2000 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 16.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH042896 ; | [A]JPH04126887 ; | [A]JPH02154094 ; | [A]GB2211324 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 15, line 11 - page 19, line 9; figure 10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920410), vol. 16, no. 144, Database accession no. (C - 927)<5187>, & JP04002896 A 19920107 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORPORATION) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920818), vol. 16, no. 387, Database accession no. (C - 975), & JP04126887 A 19920423 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORPORATION) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900904), vol. 14, no. 406, Database accession no. (C - 754)<4349>, & JP02154094 A 19900613 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORPORATION) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - S.RODING ET AL, "FEX,THE NEW STFI EXPERIMENTAL PAPER MACHINE", TAPPI JOURNAL, ATLANTA US, (198605), vol. 69, no. 5, pages 94 - 97 [A] 1,7,9 * the whole document * |