EP0592839 - Retention cage for the balls of rolling-contact bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF INDUSTRIE S.P.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II No. 83 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states SKF INDUSTRIE S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II No. 83 I-10123 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vignotto, Angelo Via Montevideo, 6 I-10134 Torino / IT | 02 /
Vidale, Onorio C.so Venezia, 5 I-10100 Torino / IT | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 93114992.6 | 17.09.1993 | [1994/16] | Priority number, date | IT1992TO00248U | 15.10.1992 Original published format: IT TO920248 U | [1994/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0592839 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592839 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/41 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
F16C19/14 (EP);
F16C33/414 (EP);
F16C33/418 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/16] | Title | German: | Kugelkäfig für die Kugeln eines Kugellagers | [1994/16] | English: | Retention cage for the balls of rolling-contact bearings | [1994/16] | French: | Cage à billes pour les billes des roulements à billes | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3157443 (DRAUDT) [A] 1 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3937535 (LADIN) [A] 1 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 42; figures 2,5,6 *; | [A]US4040687 (ROGERS) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4324444 (BUCZYNSKI) [A] 1 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 62; figures 2,3 *; | [A]GB2167816 (RIV-SKF) [A] 1 * the whole document * |