Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06211861 | Global Dossier | 02.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4232524 | 29.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0590446 | Global Dossier | 21.05.1997 | B1 | EP0590446 | 08.03.1995 | A3 | EP0590446 | 06.04.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4232524 | 29.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2106742 | 30.03.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4232524 | 29.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4232524 | 31.03.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4232524 | 29.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59306504D1 | 26.06.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4232524 | 29.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR940007006 | 26.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4232524 | 29.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5478948 | 26.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4232524 | 29.09.1992 |