EP0589383 - Stripping station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems Ltd. 530 Queen Street South Bolton, ON L7E 5S5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEMS LTD. 530 Queen Street South Bolton Ontario L7E 5S5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kresak, Paul Fedor 278 Willard Avenue Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 1Z2 / CA | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | ||
Former [1994/13] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat. Patentanwalt, Postfach 12 50 D-78229 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115079.1 | 20.09.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | US19920949588 | 23.09.1992 Original published format: US 949588 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589383 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/90, B29C49/42 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
B29C49/42069 (EP,US);
B29C49/42053 (EP);
B29C49/42115 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Station zum Entfernen von hohlen Gegenständen | [1994/13] | English: | Stripping station | [1994/13] | French: | Station de préhension | [1994/13] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/37] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2258717 (READ PHILIP C) [A] 1-3,9,10 * figure - *; | [X]US4313720 (SPURR ROBERT) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [A]DE8513938U (ENOXEX S. R. L.) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]EP0334483 (HOOVER UNIVERSAL [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE9108832U (GRONINGER) [A] 4,7,8 * figure - * |