EP0596229 - Process for cleaning exhaust gas from waste incinerators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB FLÄKT AB Sickla Allé 13 131 34 Nacka / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states ABB FLÄKT AB Sickla Allé 13 S-131 34 Nacka / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mosch, Heinrich, Dr. Taunusstrasse 8 D-35510 Butzbach / DE | 02 /
Karpf, Rudi Kettelerstrasse 4 D-63755 Alzenau / DE | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Brauns, Hans-Adolf, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Brauns, Hans-Adolf, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115104.7 | 20.09.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | DE19924233223 | 02.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233223 | [1994/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596229 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596229 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
B01D53/68 (EP);
B01D53/346 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Rauchgas aus Abfallverbrennungsanlagen | [1994/19] | English: | Process for cleaning exhaust gas from waste incinerators | [1994/19] | French: | Procédé pour la purification des gaz de fumée des incinérateurs de déchets | [1994/19] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 10.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 24.07.1996 | PT | 24.10.1996 | [2000/05] |
Former [1997/22] | PT | 24.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0296500 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [X] 1,4-6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3803652 (HÖLTER) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2725436 (HÖLTER) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0104335 (DEUTSCHE BABCOCK ANLAGEN AG) [A] 1,4-6 * page 6, line 8 - line 35; figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO8806484 (FLÄKT AB) [A] 1-4 * page 7, line 8 - line 21; figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO8907974 (FLÄKT AB) [A] 1-4 * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 36; figure 1 * |