EP0579278 - Processing of copper alloys with moderate conductivity and high strength [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLIN CORPORATION 91 Shelton Avenue New Haven, CT 06511-1837 / US | [1999/37] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states Olin Corporation 427 North Shamrock Street East Alton Illinois 62024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caron, Ronald N. 48 Meadow Circle Road Branford, Connecticut 06405 / US | 02 /
Breedis, John F. 15 Copper Kettle Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115212.8 | 25.04.1986 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | US19850727463 | 26.04.1985 Original published format: US 727463 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0579278 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0579278 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579278 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/08, C22C9/06 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
C22C9/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/49579 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/03] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Kupferlegierungen mit mittelhoher Leitfähigkeit und hoher Festigkeit | [1994/03] | English: | Processing of copper alloys with moderate conductivity and high strength | [1994/03] | French: | Fabrication d'alliages de cuivre à conductivité moyenne et à haute résistance mécanique | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 28.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86105766.9 / EP0203389 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] | Request for further processing for: | 13.01.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.1999 | Decision despatched | 02.02.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 20.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB522482 (MALLORY & CO INC P R) [A] 1-8 *Provisional specification: page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 1; Complete specification: page 3, lines 44- 130*; | [A]US4395295 (SHAPIRO EUGENE) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4025367 (PARIKH PRAKASH D, et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |