EP0644386 - Method for dynamically controlling frost formation on a refrigerator evaporator and refrigerator in which such method is implemented [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/12] | Method and device for dynamically controlling frost formation on a refrigerator evaporator | ||
[1997/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL EUROPE B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | [1998/09] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL EUROPE B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 NL-5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turetta, Daniele, Whirlpool Italia s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (va) / IT | 02 /
Rivis, Enzo, Whirlpool Italia s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (va) / IT | [1998/09] |
Former [1995/12] | 01 /
Turetta, Daniela, Whirlpool Italia s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (va) / IT | ||
02 /
Rivis, Enzo, Whirlpool Italia s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (va) / IT | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Località Cassinetta I-21024 Biandronno (VA) / IT | Application number, filing date | 93115230.0 | 22.09.1993 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644386 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644386 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F25D21/02, F25D21/00 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
F25D21/006 (EP);
F25D21/02 (EP);
F25B2700/2117 (EP);
F25D2700/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur dynamischen Kontrolle der Eisbildung an einem Kühlschrankverdampfer und Kühlschrank in dem das Verfahren angewandt ist | [1997/18] | English: | Method for dynamically controlling frost formation on a refrigerator evaporator and refrigerator in which such method is implemented | [1997/18] | French: | Procédé pour le contrôle dynamique de la formation de givre sur un évaporateur d'une armoire frigorifique et armoire frigorifique sur laquelle ce procédé est réalisé | [1997/18] |
Former [1995/12] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur dynamischen Kontrolle der Eisbildung an einem Kühlschrankverdampfer | ||
Former [1995/12] | Method and device for dynamically controlling frost formation on a refrigerator evaporator | ||
Former [1995/12] | Procédé et dispositif pour le contrôle dynamique de la formation de givre sur un évaporateur d'une armoire frigorifique | Examination procedure | 22.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1998/41] | DE | 26.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4400949 (KINOSHITA) [A] 1,4,5,7,9,12-15 * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4347709 (WU) [A] 1,12 * column 1, line 62 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4104888 (REEDY) [A] 1,7,9,12 * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 54; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US4653285 (POHL) [A] 1,12,13 * column 7, line 37 - column 16, line 49; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US4474024 (EPLETT) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 51 - column 7, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0494785 (MORRIS) [A] 3,4,6,14 * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 36; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3282065 (FLANAGAN); | [A]GB2016174 (P. R. MALLORY); | [A]US3681933 (CHECK) |