EP0633153 - Process for producing a heating or air-conditioning device with a damper with a housing wall seal, in particular for a motor vehicule [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tauber, Werner Am Hag 9 D-96257 Redwitz / DE | [1995/02] | Application number, filing date | 93115285.4 | 22.09.1993 | [1995/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633153 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633153 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, F24F13/14, F16K1/226 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
B60H1/00678 (EP,US);
F16K1/2261 (EP,US);
F24F13/1406 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00714 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0441 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49412 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49417 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1995/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Heizungs- und/oder Klimaanlage mit einer an einer Gehäusewandung dichtend anliegenden Luftklappe, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [1995/04] | English: | Process for producing a heating or air-conditioning device with a damper with a housing wall seal, in particular for a motor vehicule | [1995/02] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif de chauffage et/ou de climatisation avec un clapet à contact étanche avec la paroi du boîtier, en particulier pour un véhicule automobile | [1995/02] |
Former [1995/02] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Heizungs- und/oder Klimanalage mit einer an einer Gehäusewandung dichtend anliegenden Luftklappe, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug | Examination procedure | 28.02.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.03.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE8911657U (SIEMENS AG) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE8716119U (SÜDDEUTSCHE KÜHLERFABRIK JULIUS FR. BEHR) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8535924U (SÜDDEUTSCHE KÜHLERFABRIK JULIUS FR. BEHR) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR2550848 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - * |