EP0596234 - Headliner for the inner side roof lining of a passenger vehicle or a small bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENEFORM GmbH Lehmkuhlenweg 68 a D-31224 Peine / DE | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müser, Hermann, Dr. Kalkstrasse 10 D-40885 Ratingen / DE | 02 /
Kiesel, Gerd H., Dr. Ing. Neisser Strasse 18 D-30827 Garbsen / DE | 03 /
Blume, Wilfried Alt-Vinnhorst 109 D-30419 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Meyer, Dieter Rehflucht 25 D-30900 Wedemark / DE | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstraße 5 30175 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 D-30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115309.2 | 23.09.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | DE19924237344 | 05.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4237344 | [1994/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596234 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596234 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
B60R13/0225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, PT, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | Autohimmel für die Dachinnenverkleidung eines Personenkraftwagens oder Kleinbusses | [1994/19] | English: | Headliner for the inner side roof lining of a passenger vehicle or a small bus | [1994/19] | French: | Panneau pour la garniture intérieure de pavillon d'une voiture ou d'un petit bus | [1994/19] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 20.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1933971U (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-10 * * page 1, line 1 - page 9, line 12 *; | [A]EP0057886 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * * claims 1-8 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 15 *; | [A]EP0248199 (BENECKE GMBH J [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * abstract ** page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 23 *; | [A]US4950534 (HUANG SAN Y [TW]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 51 * |