EP0579280 - Pesticidal method using N-phenylpyrazoles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2017 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE 14-20, rue Pierre Baizet 69009 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE 14-20, rue Pierre Baizet F-69009 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states MAY & BAKER LIMITED Dagenham Essex RM10 7XS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatton, Leslie Roy May & Baker Limited Dagenham, Essex RM10 7XS / GB | 02 /
Hawkins, David William May & Baker Limited Dagenham, Essex RM10 7XS / GB | 03 /
Parnell, Edgar William May & Baker Limited Dagenham, Essex RM10 7XS / GB | 04 /
Pearson, Christopher John May & Baker Limited Dagenham, Essex RM10 7XS / GB | 05 /
Roberts, David Alan May & Baker Limited Dagenham, Essex RM10 7XS / GB | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Bentham, Stephen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93115360.5 | 19.12.1986 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | GB19850031485 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: GB 8531485 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579280 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579280 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0579280 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, A01N55/00, C07D231/38, A61K31/415, C07F7/08, C07D231/44, C07D231/40, C07D231/18, C07D231/16, C07D231/14, C07D231/12 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,KR);
A01N43/56 (EP);
A01N55/00 (EP);
A61K31/415 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
C07D231/14 (EP);
C07D231/16 (EP);
C07D231/18 (EP);
C07D231/38 (EP);
C07D231/40 (EP);
C07D231/44 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/03] | Title | German: | Pestizides-Verfahren unter Verwendung von N-Phenylpyrazolen | [1994/03] | English: | Pesticidal method using N-phenylpyrazoles | [1994/03] | French: | Méthode pesticide utilisant des N-phénylpyrazoles | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86309981.8 / EP0234119 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | 14.07.2010 | Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.12.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   13.01.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 28.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2998419 (DICKINSON JR CLIFFORD LEE, et al); | [A]US3423424 (TREPANIER DONALD L); | [AD]US3760084 (GOLDMAN L, et al); | [A]US4145554 (JONES REUBEN G, et al); | JPS5484032 [ ] (ISHIHARA MINING & CHEMICAL CO); | [A]AU508225B (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG); | [XP]EP0201852 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0200872 | [AD] - JOURNAL OF HETROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 12, no. 12, December 1975, pages 1199-1205, Provo, Utah, US; P.L. SOUTHWICK et al.: "Preparation of 4,6-diaminopyrazolo(3,4-d)pyrimidines with variations in substitution at the 1- and 3-positions(1)" | [A] - IL FARMACO ED. SCIENTIFICA, vol. XXXVIII, no. 4, April 1983, pages 274-282, Pavia, IT; P. GIORI et al.: "Synthesis and antifungal activity of pyrazole derivatives containing sulfurated functions" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19791217), vol. 91, no. 25, Database accession no. 205651P, page 181 |