EP0590577 - System for controlling valve shift timing of an engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishida, Masami, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Kurisu, Toru, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikai, Tasashi, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 04 /
Sugiura, Hiroaki, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 05 /
Enomoto, Hiroshi, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 06 /
Kanda, Masunori, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 07 /
Yanagida, Eiichi, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 08 /
Deguchi, Hiroaki, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 09 /
Fukuma, Masaki, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 10 /
Asai, Akira, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115589.9 | 27.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | JP19920262566 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: JP 26256692 | JP19930013101 | 29.01.1993 Original published format: JP 1310193 | JP19930071692 | 30.03.1993 Original published format: JP 7169293 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590577 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/34, F01L13/00 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
F01L1/34416 (EP,US);
F01L13/00 (KR);
F01L1/34 (EP,US);
F01L13/0042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/14] | Title | German: | Ventilsteuerungsregelungssystem für Brennkraftmaschine | [1994/14] | English: | System for controlling valve shift timing of an engine | [1994/14] | French: | Système de commande de variation de calage de soupape de moteur | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/02] | 21.08.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.09.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/02] | Appeal following examination | 16.10.1997 | Appeal received No. T0171/98 | 17.12.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.02.2000 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2000/06] | 24.03.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2668797 (SILVETTI GABRIEL) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [YA]JPS55148912 ; | [Y]US5080055 (KOMATSU HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3-8 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 11 * * figure 13 *; | [A]JPS5596310 ; | [A]JPS55151107 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810203), vol. 5, no. 18, Database accession no. (M - 53), & JP55148912 A 00000000 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * [A] 27 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801008), vol. 4, no. 143, Database accession no. (M - 35), & JP55096310 A 19800722 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810210), vol. 5, no. 22, Database accession no. (M - 54), & JP55151107 A 19801125 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |