EP0590612 - Frequency tunable resonator including a varactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Toru 6-3-305, Myokenzaka Katano City, 576 / JP | 02 /
Ishizaki, Toshio 2-4-12-107, Kohnan-cho Higashinada-ku, Kobe City, 658 / JP | 03 /
Nakagawa, Yoshihiro 7-10-11, Karita Sumiyoshi-ku, Osaka City, 558 / JP | 04 /
Sakakura, Makoto 51-12-401-303, Motoyashiki Makishima-cho, Uji City, 611 / JP | 05 /
Hashimoto, Koji 1-13-26, Fukae-honmachi Higashinada-ku, Kobe City, 658 / JP | 06 /
Nakamura, Toshiaki 6-50, Shinike-cho Saidaiji, Nara City, 631 / JP | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115651.7 | 28.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | JP19920259545 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25954592 | JP19930131789 | 02.06.1993 Original published format: JP 13178993 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590612 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590612 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01P7/04, H01P7/08 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
H01P7/04 (EP,US);
H01P7/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/14] | Title | German: | Frequenzabstimmbarer Resonator mit einem Varaktor | [1994/14] | English: | Frequency tunable resonator including a varactor | [1994/14] | French: | Résonateur accordable en fréquence comprenant un varactor | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4721932 (WEST JAMES B [US]) [A] 1,2,14,20,24 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0444948 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,14,20,24 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 2; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US5097237 (KOMAZAKI TOMOKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 14,20 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 2; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0069431 (CISE SPA [IT]) [A] 1,14,20,24 * page 4, line 27 - page 7, line 28; figure 1 * |