EP0631857 - Plastic injection moulding machine with a mould closing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hehl, Karl Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 32 72290 Lossburg / DE | [1998/21] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states Hehl, Karl Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 32 D-72290 Lossburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Frank, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Frank, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115688.9 | 29.09.1993 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | DE19934317997 | 29.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4317997 | DE19934320366 | 19.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4320366 | [1995/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631857 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631857 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/17, B29C45/66 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
B29C45/1761 (EP,US);
B29C45/66 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1763 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1768 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/01] | Title | German: | Kunststoff-Spritzgiessmaschine mit einer Formschliesseinheit | [1995/01] | English: | Plastic injection moulding machine with a mould closing unit | [1995/01] | French: | Machine à mouler par injection les matières plastiques avec une unité de fermeture de moule | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1993 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 15.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.05.1998 | NL | 20.05.1998 | GB | 29.09.1998 | CH | 30.09.1998 | LI | 30.09.1998 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 20.05.1998 | |
GB | 29.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | GB | 29.09.1998 | |
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 29.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59152832 ; | [X]JPS57209799 ; | [X]DE1109356 (HEINZ MAIBERGER) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2012206 (ENRIETTI L, et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [E]EP0585630 (ENGEL GMBH MASCHBAU [AT]) [E] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9417977 (SVOBODA BRUNO [AT]) [E] 1,3,5 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841226), vol. 8, no. 284, Database accession no. (M - 348)<1721>, & JP59152832 A 00000000 (YAMASHIRO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830319), vol. 7, no. 68, Database accession no. (M - 201), & JP57209799 A 00000000 (NITSUSEI JIYUSHI KOGYO) [X] 1,3 * abstract * |