EP0608483 - Method and semiconductor gas sensor device for detecting fire or explosion hazards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states RWE Energie Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 5 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states RWE Energie Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 5 45128 Essen / DE | |||
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states RWE Energie Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 5 D-45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellmann, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Geranienweg 4 D-45739 Oer-Erkenschwick / DE | 02 /
Petig, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Jupiterstrasse 26b D-45277 Essen / DE | 03 /
Kohl, Claus-Dieter, Prof.Dr. Röderring 22 D-35396 Giessen / DE | 04 /
Kelleter, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Klosterweg 1 D-35394 Giessen / DE | 05 /
Kiesewetter, Olaf, Dr.Ing. Neue Sorge 32a D-98716 Geschwenda / DE | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Epping, Wilhelm Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/31] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115747.3 | 29.09.1993 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | DE19934302367 | 28.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4302367 | [1994/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608483 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0608483 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12, G08B17/117 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
G08B17/117 (EP);
G01N27/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1994/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Halbleiter-Gassensor-Einrichtung zur Ermittlung von Brand- oder Explosionsgefahren bzw. Bränden | [1994/31] | English: | Method and semiconductor gas sensor device for detecting fire or explosion hazards | [1994/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif capteur de gaz à semi-conducteur pour la détection de risques d'incendie ou d'explosion | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 02.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 25.11.1998 | [2001/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0141090 (CERBERUS AG [CH]) [A] 1-6* claims 1-6 *; | [A]US4542640 (CLIFFORD PAUL K [US]) [A] 13 * abstract *; | [X]EP0444753 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-22 * the whole document * |