EP0590653 - Motor control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 18, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1994/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabuchi, Junichiro 14-1-304, Tsutsuyamadai 1-chome Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115755.6 | 29.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | JP19920262235 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: JP 26223592 | JP19920292733 | 30.10.1992 Original published format: JP 29273392 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590653 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590653 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05D13/62 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
H02P23/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/14] | Title | German: | Motorregelsystem | [1994/14] | English: | Motor control system | [1994/14] | French: | Système de régulation de moteur | [1994/14] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/14: Teilanmeldung 95120463.5 eingereicht am 22/12/95 | EPB 1996/14: Divisional application 95120463.5 filed on 22/12/95 | EPB 1996/14: Demande divisionnaire 95120463.5 déposée le 22/12/95 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/26] | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95120463.5 / EP0709951 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.03.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/52] | FR | 31.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0448136 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0280931 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 1,4 * the whole document * |