EP0590665 - Coated abrasive article having a tear resistant backing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harmon, Kimberly K., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115817.4 | 30.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | US19920955329 | 01.10.1992 Original published format: US 955329 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590665 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B24D11/02 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
B24D11/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/06 (KR);
B32B27/36 (KR);
B32B7/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/14] | Title | German: | Schleiffolie mit zerreissfestem Träger | [1994/14] | English: | Coated abrasive article having a tear resistant backing | [1994/14] | French: | Feuille abrasive comportant un support résistant au déchirement | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 30.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/10] | 19.10.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4867760 (YARBROUGH WALTER A [US]) [Y] 1 * column 9, line 30 - column 12, line 62 *; | [DY]US4908278 (BLAND RALPH H [US], et al) [DY] 1 * claims 1,2,31,34 *; | [A]ZA6605377 ; | [A]WO9213135 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 68, no. 00, Database accession no. 68-81920, & ZA6605377 A 00000000 (ARMOUR & CO.) [A] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 34, Database accession no. 92-284709, & WO9213135 A 19920806 (CUSTOM PAPER GROUP INC.) [A] * abstract * |