EP0591870 - Improved fuse-programmable control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashizawa, Yuichi, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwalt, Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/15] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115920.6 | 01.10.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | JP19920270047 | 08.10.1992 Original published format: JP 27004792 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0591870 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0591870 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591870 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11C17/18 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
G11C17/18 (EP,US);
H01L21/82 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1995/03] | G11C17/18, G11C17/16 | ||
Former IPC [1994/15] | G11C17/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1994/15] | Title | German: | Durch Schmelzsicherung programmierbare verbesserte Steuerschaltung | [1994/15] | English: | Improved fuse-programmable control circuit | [1994/15] | French: | Circuit amélioré de commande programmable par fusible | [1998/25] |
Former [1994/15] | Circuit de commande programmable par fusible amélioré | Examination procedure | 03.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0491490 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,9,15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0419760 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,9,15 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 38; figures 1,2 * | [A] - MANO ET AL, "A Redundancy Circuit for a 256K MOS RAM", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, NEW YORK US, (198208), vol. SC-17, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/JSSC.1982.1051803, XP000819512 [A] 1,9,15 * page 727, column R, line 52 - page 729, column L, line 29; figures 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.1982.1051803 |