EP0596262 - Process for the preparation of sterile beta-lactam antibiotics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISTITUTO BIOCHIMICO ITALIANO GIOVANNI LORENZINI S.p.A. Via G. Ripamonti, 332/4 I-20141 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states ISTITUTO BIOCHIMICO ITALIANO GIOVANNI LORENZINI S.p.A. Via G. Ripamonti, 332/4 I-20141 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corsi, Giordano Bruno Via Ovidio 133, Località Colli di Cicerone I-00045 Genzano (Roma) / IT | 02 /
Brandt, Alberto Via Cerveteri 18 I-00100 Roma / IT | 03 /
Cecchetelli, Loredana Via Paolo VI I-00040 Castelgandolfo (Roma) / IT | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Beneduce, Gianna Via Poggibonsi 7 20146 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Beneduce, Gianna Via Poggibonsi 7 I-20146 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1994/19] | Beneduce, Gianna Via Poggibonsi, 7 I-20146 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93115972.7 | 04.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI02296 | 05.10.1992 Original published format: IT MI922296 | [1994/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596262 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596262 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D499/16, C07D499/68 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
C07D499/00 (EP,US);
C07D499/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von sterilen beta-Lactam-Antibiotika | [1996/21] | English: | Process for the preparation of sterile beta-lactam antibiotics | [1994/19] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des agents antibiotiques stériles du type bêta-lactame | [1994/19] |
Former [1994/19] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von stabilen beta-Lactam-Antibiotika | Examination procedure | 18.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1543317 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [A]GB2096599 (BRISTOL MYERS CO); | [AD]EP0131147 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0220925 (ANTIBIOTICOS SA [ES]) |