EP0591900 - Resin-sealed semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki 210 / JP | [1994/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagaune, Fumio, c/o Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki, 210 / JP | 02 /
Matsushita, Hiroaki, c/o Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki, 210 / JP | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 93116022.0 | 04.10.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | JP19920265222 | 05.10.1992 Original published format: JP 26522292 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0591900 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0591900 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591900 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/04, H01L23/24, H01L23/495 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
H01L23/49562 (EP,US);
H01L23/04 (EP,US);
H01L23/24 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/15] | H01L23/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/15] | Title | German: | In Harz versiegeltes Halbleiterbauelement | [1994/15] | English: | Resin-sealed semiconductor device | [1994/15] | French: | Dispositif à semiconducteur scellé dans de la résine | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5710952 ; | [A]JPH025559 ; | [A]JPH01106457 ; | [Y]US3995932 (KUHN EDWARD H) [Y] 3 * figure - *; | [Y]DE2652708 (ALSTHOM CGEE) [Y] 5-7 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DD141736 (FRIEDRICH WERNER, et al) [Y] 8-10 * figure - *; | [Y]EP0112512 (IDEC IZUMI CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * page 5, line 5, paragraphs 1-3 - line 25 *; | [Y]US4880400 (BAUBLES RICHARD C [US]) [Y] 8 * figures 3-5 *; | [Y]WO9115873 (MCB SOCIETE ANONYME [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820507), vol. 6, no. 72, Database accession no. (E - 105), & JP57010952 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 4,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900316), vol. 14, no. 142, Database accession no. (E - 0904), & JP02005559 A 19900110 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890803), vol. 13, no. 346, Database accession no. (E - 798), & JP01106457 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |