blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0594057

EP0594057 - Parallel guiding device of a brake shoe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.1996
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.07.1996 [1996/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE AG
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/17]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE AG
Moosacher Strasse 80
D-80809 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bartlechner, Manfred
Am Katzenstein 1
D-82234 Wessling / DE
02 / Fuderer, Erich
Rosenstrasse 31
D-82110 Germering / DE
03 / Staltmeir, Josef
Knorrstrasse 83
D-80807 München / DE
[1994/17]
Application number, filing date93116624.314.10.1993
[1994/17]
Priority number, dateDE1992423531020.10.1992         Original published format: DE 4235310
[1994/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0594057
Date:27.04.1994
Language:DE
[1994/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0594057
Date:19.07.1995
Language:DE
[1995/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.1994
ClassificationIPC:B61H1/00
[1994/17]
CPC:
B61H1/003 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1994/17]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Parallelführung des Bremsklotzschuhs einer Klotzbremse[1994/17]
English:Parallel guiding device of a brake shoe[1994/17]
French:Dispositif pour le mouvement parallèle d'un sabot de frein[1994/17]
Examination procedure01.02.1994Examination requested  [1994/17]
27.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.01.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.1995Fee for grant paid
24.03.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2150631  (PIRON EMIL H)[A] 1;
 [A]FR67332E  (WESTINGHOUSE FREINS & SIGNAUX) [A] 1,2 * page 2, column L, line 42 - page 3, column L, line 6; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE2008137  (CIE DES FREINS ET SIGNAUX WESTINGHOUSE) [A] 1,5 * page 7, line 28 - page 10, line 29; figure 2 *;
 [A]US3696892  (ENGLE THOMAS H) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 47; figures 2-4 *;
 [AD]EP0137431  (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.