EP0593056 - Information signal recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakai, Seiichi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kita, Mikio, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93116637.5 | 14.10.1993 | [1994/16] | Priority number, date | JP19920301754 | 14.10.1992 Original published format: JP 30175492 | [1994/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0593056 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0593056 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0593056 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/467, G11B15/473, G11B27/032, G11B15/18 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
G11B27/036 (EP,US);
G11B5/58 (KR);
G11B15/1875 (EP,US);
G11B15/4676 (EP,US);
G11B15/4735 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
G11B27/032 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/16] | G11B15/467, G11B15/473, G11B27/032 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1994/16] | Title | German: | Informationssignalaufzeichnungsgerät | [1994/16] | English: | Information signal recording apparatus | [1994/16] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement de signal d'information | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0488640 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,12-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 11 - column 4, line 25 *; | [A]JPH01107355 ; | [A]EP0170223 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890807), vol. 013, no. 349, Database accession no. (P - 911), & JP01107355 A 19890425 (CANON INC) [A] 1,3,12-14 * abstract * |