EP0602343 - Abnormality detection circuit for a motor for use in a copier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Hiroyuki, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Maekawa, Yoshikazu, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Maruyama, Kazuhisa, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ushio, Masaru, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Sato, Junji, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Sakata, Satoshi, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Kudo, Tomoo, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Matsudaira, Tadashi, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93116822.3 | 19.10.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | JP19920309641 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: JP 30964192 | JP19920322568 | 06.11.1992 Original published format: JP 32256892 | JP19920323687 | 09.11.1992 Original published format: JP 32368792 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0602343 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0602343 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
G05B23/0256 (EP,US);
G03G15/5004 (EP);
G03G15/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/25] | Title | German: | Fehlererkennungsschaltung für einen Motor in Kopiergeräten | [1994/25] | English: | Abnormality detection circuit for a motor for use in a copier | [1994/25] | French: | Circuit de détection d'irrégularités pour un moteur dans une machine à copier | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 31.10.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2226896 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7; | [A]US4601568 (TAKANO SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 7,8 |